THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:06:49 AM
Harmathy, Tibor Andras
CPSO#:
50683
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hungarian
Education: University of Ottawa, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Colborne St W
Orillia ON L3V 2Z3
Phone: 705-325-2201
Electoral District: 05
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to a copy of their medical record can contact DocuDavit Solutions: 1-888-781-9083.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital |
Orillia |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:07 Oct 2012 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIBOR ANDRAS HARMATHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARMATHY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1984 |