THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:55:26 AM
Mailis, Angela
CPSO#:
50671
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1978
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Hamodraka Malis, Angeliki Nikolaou (used until: 02 May 1993 )
Hamodraka Mailis, Angeliki Nikolaou (used until: 03 Jan 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Athens, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Pain & Wellness Centre
2301 Major MacKenzie Dr West
Unit 101
Vaughan ON L6A 3Z3
Phone: 1-800-597-5733 Ext. 3
Fax: 844-358-9308
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:03 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANGELA MAILIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAILIS is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jun 1983 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1983 |