THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:24:26 AM
Tremblay, Pamela Margaret
CPSO#:
50669
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
16 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Apr 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Hamer, Pamela Margaret (used until: 19 Jun 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P. Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 15 2013
Corporation Name: Pamela Tremblay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Glazier Medical Centre, 11 Gibb Street, Oshawa, ON L1H 2J9
Date Received: 15 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:24 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Apr 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 16 Jun 2015 |