THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:33:13 PM
Halmo, Stephen Douglas
CPSO#:
50668
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Stephen Halmo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Capital Files Services
PO Box 45051
Kitchener ON N2C 2R6
Phone# 519-590-8477
Email: [email protected]
Date Received: 02 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:05 Jun 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 May 2022 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On February 23, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in London, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Halmo.