THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 17:08:17 PM
Hadian, Abbas
CPSO#:
50663
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Aug 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Haji-Hadian, Abbas (used until: 30 Oct 1986 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi, Iranian
Education: Tehran University of Medical Sciences Sc, 1960
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hadian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 16 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Aug 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: April 23, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Abbas Hadian to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario efective April 23, 2018:
The College conducted investigations into whether Dr. Hadian failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in his general medicine practice. During the investigations, Dr. Hadian resigned from the College, effective August 1, 2018 and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. As a result, the College took no further action on the investigations.