THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:06:40 AM
Gurr, Kevin Robert
CPSO#:
50653
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
29 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Sep 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Kevin R. Gurr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 29 2023
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:London Health Sciences Centre
Health Records Department
519-685-8500 ext. 52865
Date Received: 15 Feb 2024
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2023 |