THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:45:07 AM
Gillis, Katharine Anne
CPSO#:
50643
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
09 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jun 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Gillis, Katharine Anne (used until: 28 May 1986 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: K. Gillis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:31 Dec 1995 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Sep 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 09 May 2023 |