THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 18:07:25 PM
Garber, Gary Erwyn
CPSO#:
50620
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 May 1986
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 May 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Calgary, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
875 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1S 5P1
Phone: 613 725 9965 Ext. 575
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Infectious Diseases |
Effective:02 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. GARY ERWYN GARBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GARBER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Sep 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 May 1986 |