THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 6:25:39 AM
Gallant, Tsvi
CPSO#:
50615
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 1990
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Italian, Spanish
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102- 3077 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M6A 1Z9
Phone: (416)789 4376
Fax: (416) 741-9131
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2009
Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should fax their medical records request to Dr. Gallant at: 416-391-4090.
Date Received: 09 Jan 2020
Instructions/Address:Patients should fax their medical record requests to Dr. Gallant at: 416-741-9131.
Date Received: 14 Feb 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TSVI GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1990 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Apr 1990 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1990 |