THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 22:11:27 PM
Gallant, Lee Ann
CPSO#:
50614
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Italian
Education: Sackler School of Medicine, Tel Aviv Uni, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
102-3077 Bathurst St
Toronto ON M6A 1Z9
Phone: (416) 789-4376
Fax: (416) 789-5321
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 10 2009
Corporation Name: Gallant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEE ANN GALLANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLANT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1986 |