THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:37:03 AM
Fremes, Stephen Edward
CPSO#:
50594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
H Wing Room 405
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6073
Fax: (416) 480-4439
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN EDWARD FREMES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREMES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 5 - Cardiovascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
CF - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 1986 |