THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 20:02:01 PM
Fountas, Panayiotis Nikolas
CPSO#:
50582
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Greek
Education: University of Athens, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Fountas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 30 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Fountas’ medical records remained with Dr. Michael Lekas (CPSO 73783) at the same practice location
833 Coxwell Avenue, Toronto ON M4C 3E8
416 467 6555
Date Received: 09 Dec 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:07 Dec 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2021 |