THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:41:56 AM
Fong, Sung Ken
CPSO#:
50574
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Mar 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth S Fong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 16 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:03 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Mar 2021 |