THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:20:08 AM
Feanny, Stephen John
CPSO#:
50535
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Aug 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
101-645 Remembrance Rd
Brampton ON L7A 5H2
Phone: 1416560196 Ext. na
Fax: 289 720 2074
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Nov 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN FEANNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEANNY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 May 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 1986 |