THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 13:34:09 PM
Farnell, Barbara Anne
CPSO#:
50524
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Feb 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Polish
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BARBARA ANNE FARNELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARNELL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Jul 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 1985 |