THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:52:05 AM
Farmer, James Patrick
CPSO#:
50523
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
725 Arlington Park Pl
Kingston ON K7M 7E4
Phone: 613-417-3451
Fax: 613-417-3452
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site |
Ottawa |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:23 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:31 May 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK FARMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARMER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Other - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1984 |