THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 23:17:55 PM
Farewell, John Clarence
CPSO#:
50520
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
GD PO
24 Canadian Forces Health Services
Astra ON K0K 3W0
Phone: 613 392 2811 Ext. 3651
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Campbellford Memorial Hospital |
Campbellford |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Peterborough Regional Health Centre |
Peterborough |
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN CLARENCE FAREWELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FAREWELL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Rotating Internship
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Research Fellows - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1984 |