THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 3:53:07 AM
Elliott, Deborah Lynn
CPSO#:
50501
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Sep 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Dec 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health Services
CFB Kingston
PO Box 17000, Stn Forces
Kingston Ont
Kingston ON K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541 5010 Ext. 5776
Fax: (613) 541 4607
Electoral District: 06
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DEBORAH LYNN ELLIOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELLIOTT is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1984 |