THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:51:04 AM
Wu, Raymond Hon Chuen
CPSO#:
50491
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jan 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unionville Family Medical Clinic
1 - 8 Cox Blvd
Markham ON L3R 4G1
Phone: (905) 470-6840
Fax: (905) 470-6841
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Hong Kong S A R
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAYMOND HON CHUEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1987 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2018 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 04 Jun 2018 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 May 2018
Summary:
On May 1, 2018, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Raymond Hon Chuen Wu committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, and in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as unprofessional.
Dr. Raymond Wu is a general physician who received his certificate of registration authorizing independent practice in 1987. At the relevant time, Dr. Raymond Wu was acting as a locum at a family medicine practice in Markham and also has his own family medicine practice in Markham.
Dr. Raymond Wu’s locum in Dr. Howard Wu’s practice
Dr. Raymond Wu acted as a locum in the practice of his nephew, Dr. Howard Wu, from June 2013 to December 2013, where he practised two days a week, seeing 60-70 patients per day, while Dr. Howard Wu’s certificate of registration was suspended. In his capacity as a locum in Dr. Howard Wu’s practice, Dr. Raymond Wu supervised employees of Dr. Howard Wu who were international medical graduates (the “IMGs”). In accordance with the office procedures established by Dr. Howard Wu, the IMGs saw patients on their own and discussed their findings, assessments and management plans with Dr. Raymond Wu. Dr. Raymond Wu then signed prescriptions and any notes the patients required.
Some patients seen by the IMGs and for whom Dr. Raymond Wu completed medical device claims and prescribed medical devices were referred by the physiotherapy clinic next door for assessment of their musculoskeletal complaints.
College Investigation
The College commenced investigation, after Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (“Sun Life”) contacted the College, expressing concerns that Dr. Raymond Wu had been inappropriately completing medical device claims and prescribing medical devices for patients where there was no medical necessity. The College retained an expert to provide an opinion on Dr. Raymond Wu’s standard of practice.
The expert reviewed the charts of six patients identified by Sun Life as having prescriptions signed by Dr. Raymond Wu for whom he prescribed medical devices while he was acting as a locum in Dr. Howard Wu’s office. The expert opined that Dr. Raymond Wu’s documentation fell below the standard of care expected of a family physician in the six charts reviewed, including a lack of detailed history of the patients’ presenting complaints, a lack of relevant past medical history, a lack of a detailed and clinical exam relevant to the patients’ presenting complaints and a lack of assessments and diagnoses. The expert pointed out the following concerns regarding Dr. Raymond Wu’s documentation and patient care:
- The history of the presenting complaint is similar in all six charts reviewed: “pain in the low back and neck (off and on chronic)”. No further details specific to each patient is documented.
- The clinical exam findings are similar on all six charts reviewed: “paravertebrae tenderness reduce ROM, Neuro Neg” and in some patents a comment that a particular joint “was tender to palpation”.
- No exam findings documented of other joints that the patients were complaining of as being painful.
- No investigations were ordered to aid in the diagnoses of the patient complaint (x-ray, ultrasound, MRI or EMG).
- Lack of documented assessment or diagnoses.
- Recommendations for treatment are similar: “RICE Posture Better Support Shoes Strengthening, PT and meds as needed”.
- For a patient that Dr. Raymond Wu has counselled there are four phrases that he uses. There is no information documented that is specific to the patient who was seen.
- Dr. Raymond Wu documents “and meds as needed”. There is no information regarding the name and dosage of the medications or the duration of the treatment.
- The documentation for follow-up visits lacks information regarding the patients response to treatments recommended.
- No documentation to support the use of support stockings, TENS machine, back brace, knee braces, ankle braces, elbow braces and wrist braces.
- Concern regarding the use of multiple braces per patient.
- Inappropriate use of braces for pain control and that the duration of brace use is for one year.
The expert further opined that bracing can be used as an adjunct to other treatment modalities for patients presenting with musculoskeletal complaints. However, the expert noted that for the six patients, whose charts were reviewed, there was insufficient documentation of history, clinical examination and investigations to support their use. Also, the expert noted that, it is not the standard of clinical practice to use multiple bracing at one time and for the duration of one year and that these patients did not receive follow-up care to assess if the bracing was of clinical benefit in reducing their pain. The expert further opined that during the six months Dr. Raymond Wu was a locum of Dr. Howard Wu, he showed a lack of skill and knowledge with respect to his documentation of patient encounters. According to the expert, Dr. Raymond Wu lacked judgement, in that he either saw patients or supervised the International Medical Graduates seeing patients sent from the physiotherapy clinic next door for the purpose of receiving prescriptions for bracing, support stockings and TENS machines.
The expert also reviewed five further patient charts received from Dr. Raymond Wu’s own family practice clinic and noted no concerns with regard to these five charts and patient care. The expert opined that Dr. Raymond Wu met the standard of care expected of a family physician in a busy urban setting.
Disposition
On May 1, 2018, the Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar suspend Dr. Wu’s certificate of registration for a period of one (1) month, commencing May 4, 2018 at 11:59 p.m.
- Dr. Wu attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
- Dr. Wu pay costs to the College in the amount of $6,000.00 within 30 days of the date this Order becomes final.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): May 1, 2018