THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:34:09 PM
Boate, Brian William
CPSO#:
50483
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Apr 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Boate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 3 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd
1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13
Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
[email protected]
1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 30 May 2022
Instructions/Address:Medical records location: Records Management Ltd.
Patients looking to obtain copies of the medical charts should
contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093, email to:
[email protected], or send written request by mail to: 1 High
Meadow Place Unit 13 Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 05 Feb 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:06 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |