THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:53:40 AM
Elavathil, Leelamma Jacob
CPSO#:
50479
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Sep 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Malayalam
Education: University of Kerala, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington ON L78 0A2
Phone: 905 336 4122
Fax: 905 336 6483
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Pathology |
Effective:29 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:12 Dec 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LEELAMMA JACOB ELAVATHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAVATHIL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1984 |