THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:25:18 AM
O'Dea, Mary Joan
CPSO#:
50447
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Feb 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Names:
Donaghy, Mary Joan (used until: 22 Nov 1984 )
O'Dea Donaghy, Mary Joan (used until: 21 Jun 1984 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University College, Galway, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: S Donaghy and M O'Dea Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 10 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Unit 100 - 150 Main Street East, Grimsby, Ontario L3M 1P1
Date Received: 01 Feb 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2021 |