THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 1:58:17 AM
Devito, Isabella
CPSO#:
50429
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Oct 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:25 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ISABELLA DEVITO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEVITO is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1987 |