THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 0:35:24 AM
Denstedt, John Douglas
CPSO#:
50425
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Sep 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Sep 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Center
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6036
Fax: (519) 646-6037
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:17 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS DENSTEDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DENSTEDT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 4 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
CF - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1987 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1987 |