THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 3:47:29 AM
Chow, Donald
CPSO#:
50405
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Aug 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
10 Aug 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sports Medicine Clinic
1565 Maple Grove Rd
Kanata ON K2V 1A3
Phone: (613) 591-3939
Fax: (613) 591-3265
Electoral District: 07
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 16 2024
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: February 12, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
The College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario received notice from The Ottawa Hospital of a suspension of privileges held by Dr. Donald Chow. The suspension is effective February 12, 2010 to March 14, 2010.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DONALD CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 09 Aug 2022 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: February 11, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: October 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective February 5, 2019, Dr. Donald Chow has completed all components of his SCERP.
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.
Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)