THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:33:40 AM
Choi-Fung, Betty Lai See
CPSO#:
50403
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: Loma Linda Univ School of Medicine, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
209-1262 Don Mills Rd
North York ON M3B 2W7
Phone: 416-429-4110
Fax: 416-429-1564
Electoral District: 10
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients should contact RECORDS ACCESS SERVICES CANADA, INC. (RASCI) at 1- (800)-971-8038
Date Received: 10 Apr 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jul 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BETTY LAI SEE CHOI-FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOI-FUNG is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1983 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2020 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2021 |