THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:03:37 PM
Champion, Lois Kathleen
CPSO#:
50380
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7-2014 Valleyrun Blvd
London ON N6G 5N8
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: LK Champion Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:06 Jun 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LOIS KATHLEEN CHAMPION may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPION is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jun 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Apr 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |