THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 6:52:26 AM
Castagna, Luigi Alexander
CPSO#:
50374
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 May 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German, Italian
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 415
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-4848
Fax: (416) 431-5940
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LUIGI ALEXANDER CASTAGNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTAGNA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Paediatric Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 May 1984 |