THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:22:41 AM
Davidson, John Scott Douglas
CPSO#:
50364
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
12 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Dec 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:23 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Dec 2022 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2022 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jun 2023 |