THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 17:47:27 PM
Carling-Chambers, Lucille Barbara
CPSO#:
50347
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Mar 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Carling, Lucille Barbara (used until: 26 Jul 1989 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Queen's University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. L.B. Carling-Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2022
Corporation Name: Dr. L.B. Carling-Chambers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 31 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:07 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Dec 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Mar 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2023 |