THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 12:08:14 PM
Carlier, Maureen Theresa
CPSO#:
50346
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
13 Sep 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Andhra University, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Carlier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 23 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Date Received: 30 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2016 |