THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 4:22:31 AM
Campbell, James Daniel
CPSO#:
50338
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jun 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. J. Dan Campbell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 6 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1313 preachers lane
Haliburton ontario
K0M 1S0
Date Received: 06 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:18 Nov 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:22 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jun 1987 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2022 |