THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:00:29 PM
Byrne, Paul
CPSO#:
50328
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Nov 1989
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: P.G. Byrne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage and Retrieval Services
111 St Regis Cres S
North York ON M3J 1Y6
Phone# 416-398-0638
or
Phone# 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 02 Jul 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:21 Nov 1989 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1987 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Nov 1989 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2019 |