THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 22:39:12 PM
Buzon, Antonio Angeles
CPSO#:
50326
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Sep 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Antonio A. Buzon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Records Management Ltd.
Unit 13
1 High Meadow Place
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 27 Jun 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Sep 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jul 2017 |