THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 23:34:12 PM
Alexander, Michael
CPSO#:
50325
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Sep 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Buttoo, Manmohan Singh (used until: 13 Jul 1995 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Manchester Medical School, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
11
11
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7H9
Phone: 9053741405
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:08 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology |
Effective:03 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL ALEXANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALEXANDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 1983 |