THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:02:59 AM
Curtis, Margaret Anne
CPSO#:
50313
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
29 Park Road
Toronto ON M4W 2N2
Phone: (416) 922-9620
Fax: 416-922-4358
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Dermatology |
Effective:20 Nov 1990 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE CURTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CURTIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Dermatology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 1988 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1985 |