THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 2:38:09 AM
Curran, Michael John
CPSO#:
50312
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Michael J. Curran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 21 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:02 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |