THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 7:08:32 AM
Clark, Robert Norman
CPSO#:
50258
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Oct 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Robert N. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2022
Corporation Name: Robert N. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 29 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:30 Nov 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:26 Jun 1986 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Oct 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Apr 2023 |