THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 1:26:24 AM
Burnstein, Marcus Jeffrey
CPSO#:
50232
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jul 1992
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jul 1992
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
16 - 046
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-6050
Fax: 416-864-5668
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Marcus Burnstein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 14 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:20 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARCUS JEFFREY BURNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Aug 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jul 1992 |