THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 0:19:36 AM
Burns, Paulette Elizabeth
CPSO#:
50231
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jun 1982
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 May 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 416
5 Armstrong Point Rd
Port Carling ON P0B 1J0
Phone: (705) 765-5349
Fax: (705) 765-5377
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PAULETTE ELIZABETH BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Jun 1982 to 14 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1984 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1986 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 1987 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2022 |