THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 11:29:56 AM
Bryans, John Spencer
CPSO#:
50218
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
19 Apr 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: John S. Bryans Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 15 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:301-460 Wellington St
St Thomas ON N5R 6H9
Date Received: 07 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |