THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:53:58 PM
Bronson, David William
CPSO#:
50204
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 Jun 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. David Bronson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:P O box 795 Timmins, ON P4N 7G7
Date Received: 20 Apr 2015
Instructions/Address:P O Box 795
Timmins, ON P4N 7G7
Date Received: 19 Jan 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |