THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:30:25 PM
Brisbin, Donald Perry
CPSO#:
50200
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Apr 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Donald P. Brisbin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 1 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may write to the address above.
R R 1
Paincourt Ontario
N0P 1Z0
Date Received: 29 May 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1980 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 1985 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2020 |