THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 23:44:29 PM
Braig, Florian Gustav Adolf
CPSO#:
50195
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, German
Education: Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Florian Braig and Dr. Tuyet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 2 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery |
Effective:07 Sep 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Sep 2021 |