THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:36:58 AM
Borrie, Michael John
CPSO#:
50182
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1985
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Otago, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:09 Jun 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Medicine |
Effective:04 Dec 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN BORRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORRIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1981 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1985 |