THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:48:08 AM
Boland, Margaret Patricia
CPSO#:
50177
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
28 Apr 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaret P. Boland Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:The Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Health Records Department
401 Smyth Rd,
Ottawa, ON
K1H 8L1
Date Received: 28 May 2020
Instructions/Address:Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 01 May 2020
Instructions/Address:
Patients seeking a copy of their medical record should contact: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario, 401 Smyth Road, Ottawa ON, K1H 8L1, Tel: 613-737-7600, Fax: 613-738-4854
Date Received: 21 Nov 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:28 Sep 1999 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Other - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1982 to 01 Sep 1983
Research Fellows - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
CF - Pediatrics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Aug 1986
CF - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Apr 2020 |