THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 10:50:23 AM
Berinstein, Neil Lorne
CPSO#:
50151
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 1988
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jul 1988
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Odette Sunnybrook Regional
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5248
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:05 Sep 1985 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NEIL LORNE BERINSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERINSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 21 Oct 1985 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 1988 |