THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 5:34:27 AM
Bested, Alison Christine
CPSO#:
50147
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Jun 1979
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
04 Jan 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Nova Southeastern University
Center for Collaborative Research
3321 College Ave Suite 405
Davie FL 33314
United States
Phone: 945 262-2898
Fax: 945 262-3850
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Bested Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 12 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:13 Dec 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALISON CHRISTINE BESTED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BESTED is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1979 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1984 |