THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:08:02 AM
Bernstein, Mark Aaron
CPSO#:
50142
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Oct 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Ottawa, 1976
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
West Wing 4W-451
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6499
Fax: (416) 603-5298
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1984 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARK AARON BERNSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERNSTEIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1980 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1982 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 1983 |