THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 17:46:18 PM
Berezowskyj, Alexandra Irene
CPSO#:
50140
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
12 Jul 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Jun 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Ukrainian
Education: University of Toronto, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Alexandra Berezowskyj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may send a written request to: Suite 510, 89 Queensway Avenue West, Mississauga, ON L5B 2V2. Tel: 905-273-4380, Fax: 905-273-4335
Date Received: 22 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1984 |
CFPC Specialist |
FCFP - Family Medicine |
Effective:10 Dec 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1982 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1984 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jul 2021 |